- ECE/EL/SD360-362.
- Ffeil
- 1865 Jan. 25 - 1872 Nov. 7.
A lease and counterpart leases from the Bishop of St Davids of a parcel of land called The Marsh or Corse Goodwick to Thomas Lewis of Dyffryn, p. Llanunda, esq.
A lease and counterpart leases from the Bishop of St Davids of a parcel of land called The Marsh or Corse Goodwick to Thomas Lewis of Dyffryn, p. Llanunda, esq.
Leases, counterpart leases (and surrenders of lease) from the Bishop of St Davids of messuages called Killyvawr, Trefgrage and Crof Llan (occupant named) and other properties in Trevaser and other properties in Trevaser and other messuages in the town and fields of Llanunda, Porthcey and Tregadog (occupant named) and tenements in Caergowellucha and Caergowellissa (occupants named) and messuages in Treatho (occupant named) to the following lessees:. 3 Nov. 1834: William James of Trevelgarn, p. St Nicholas, co. Pemb., gent. 15 Feb. 1843: John James of Trenewydd, p. Llanunda, gent.
Lease counterpart leases (and a surrender of lease) from the Bishop of St Davids of a large piece of mountain called Llwydiart Forest within p. Llan y Kiven and Barony of Llawhaden and 14 messuages thereon (occupants named) and one water corn grist mill called Llwydiart Mill and three tenements near thereto and three tenements in or near Llan y Kiven called Clyn Llewhelin, Rhwedyan and Gyddyn Maden to the following lessees:. 11 Apr. 1825: Sir John Owen of Orielton, co. Pemb., Bart. 25 Oct. 1845: Charles Augustus Samuel Morgan of Tredegar, co. Mon., esq.
Leases, counterpart leases and confirmations (and surrenders of lease) from the Bishop of St Davids of messuages called Penyvydir and Castle Morris in the hundred of Dewsland to the following lessees:. 26 July 1830: Robert Henry Jenkinson of Norbiton Hall, co. Surrey, esq. 8 July 1845: Frances Augusta Jenkinson of Bevere, co. Worcester. 14 Feb. 1867: ECE.
Rules and regulations for letting and working the stone belonging to the ECE upon certain lands
Leases, counterpart leases (surrenders of lease and an assignment of lease) from the Bishop of St Davids of m. and lands containing 4 a. of Bishop's Measure in the Townred or fields of Llandenoy in the Lordship of Dewsland (occupants named) and parcels of land called Errow Dervy and Erva East Cott and West Cott or Cotty within the Lordship of Dewsland (occupants named) and all the Lord Bishop's Four Acres of Land in Letgall, p. Whitechurch (occupants named) to the following lessees:. 14 Dec. 1830: John Vaughan of Llandenoy, p. Llanrythan, co. Pemb., farmer; John Richards of Trevine, p. Llanryan, co. Pemb., farmer; and John Harries of p. Whitechurch, co. Pemb., farmer. 4 Dec. 1837: William Morgan of Abercastle, co. Pemb., esq. 9 Feb. 1852: John Vaughan of Llanoy, p. Llandenoy, co. Pemb., farmer. 21 Mar. 1863: David James of Llanrian, co. Pemb., farmer.
A lease and counterpart lease (and a grant and deed of covenant for the production of title deeds) from the Bishop of St Davids of Ramsey Island or Ynys Tevarogg and 400 a. pasture land to the following lessees:. 21 Sept. 1832: William Bowlas Summers of Moor, p. Welwyn's Castle, co. Pemb., esq., eldest son of John Summers, late of the same, esq., deceased. 3 Apr. 1860: Thomas Llewellin of Treginis, p. St Davids, esq.
Mortgage (lease for three lives) by William Williams of the Grove Hotel, St Davids, innkeeper for £1,300 (5%) of property as in ECE/EL/SD474 to John James of Trenewydd, co. Pemb., esq.
Grant by the ECE of reversion in leasehold premises called Carnwchwar to John Morgan Williams of Spring Gardens, St Davids, gent.
Parishes of St Davids and Whitechurch
Accounts of the St Davids Vicars Choral kept by Messrs Harvey relating to the tithes of St Davids and Whitchurch. Three items, including plans.
Survey by Gilbert Varloe of the lands belonging to the sub-chanter and Vicars Choral of St Davids
Leases and counterpart leases from the Chantor and Chapter or Dean and Chapter of St Davids of the Rectory, Parsonage and tithes of St Edrins to the following lessees:. 25 July 1828: Rev. John Williams of Abercamlais, co. Brec., clerk. 25 July 1844: Howell Powell of Cwmysh, p. Devynnock, co. Brec., executor of the late J.W. 11 Aug. 1865: Rev. Garnons Williams of Abercamlais, co. Brec., clerk, devisee under the will of J.W.
Lease from the Prebendary of St Nicholas of m. called Domus Iuxta Pontem within the close of St Davids (occupants named) to John Propert of St Davids, co. Pemb., gent.